Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 08/14/2020 at 01:47:28 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Rachael Warner Sanchez And Kevin Marshall Newton

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Rachael Warner Sanchez And Kevin Marshall Newton was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sanchez, Rachael Warner

Mckinney, TX 75070

Respondent

Newton, Kevin Marshall

Little Elm, TX 75068

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($2.00); Payor: Sanchez, Rachael Warner; Receipt: Receipt # DC-04849-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $2.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAustin Form; Comments: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketFinal Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDivorce Prove Up - Docket Entry; Comments: Divorce Granted. Henry Wade, Senior Judge sitting by assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($1.00); Payor: Sanchez, Rachael Warner; Receipt: Receipt # DC-01349-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $1.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($394.00); Payor: Sanchez, Rachael Warner; Receipt: Receipt # DC-34698-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $2.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $309.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketConstable Service Fee #3, $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet; Comments: Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $314.00; Comments: Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less