Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/03/2021 at 16:57:48 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Melissa Marrufo and Isaac Marrufo and in the Interest of I.M.M. and M.C.M., a Child

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 In the Matter of the Marriage of Melissa Marrufo and Isaac Marrufo and in the Interest of I M M and M C M , a Child was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Marrufo, Melissa

Mckinney, TX 75069

Respondent

Marrufo, Isaac

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dana C. Palmer

Respondent Attorney

J. Eric Higgins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketTemporary Orders Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $327.00, Payments: $327.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($65.00); Payor: Marrufo, Isaac; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03153-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $327.00, Payments: $327.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $65.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCounter Petition $65.00; Comments: Original Counterpetition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $327.00, Payments: $327.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($327.00); Payor: Marrufo, Melissa; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03122-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $327.00, Payments: $327.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $327.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Melissa Marrufo's Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Eric Higgins