Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/17/2021 at 15:44:45 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Martin John Groves vs.Anne Shelia Groves

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 In the Matter of the Marriage of Martin John Groves filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Anne Shelia Groves. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Groves, Martin John

Wylie, TX 75098

Respondent

Groves, Anne Shelia

Allen, TX 75013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

W. Tyler Edmondson

Respondent Attorney

Jennifer Barnett-LaFleur

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Filing of Austin Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAustin Form; Comments: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAgreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($65.00); Payor: Groves, Anne Shelia; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03971-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $65.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Affidavit of Service - Citation - Anne Shelia Groves

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: Groves, Martin John; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03399-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: Second Amended Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: First Amended Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($314.00); Payor: Groves, Martin John; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00377-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $314.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer W. Tyler Edmondson