Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 12/03/2020 at 12:50:14 (UTC).

In The Matter Of The Marriage Of Marcia Hogan And Jeffrey Dean Hogan

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 In The Matter Of The Marriage Of Marcia Hogan And Jeffrey Dean Hogan was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hogan, Marcia

Mckinney, TX 75070

Respondent

Hogan, Jeffrey Dean

Frisco, TX 75035

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Holly Joy Draper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($3.00); Payor: Draper, Holly Joy; Receipt: Receipt # DC-19556-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $3.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMotion to Sign; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order; Comments: Military Retired Pay Division Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketMotion; Comments: Motion to Sign Military Retired Pay Division Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($2.00); Payor: Court Record Research Inc; Receipt: Receipt # DC-15669-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $2.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAgreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Formal Settlement Offer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($314.00); Payor: Hogan, Marcia; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00312-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $314.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $314.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holly Joy Draper