Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/18/2021 at 02:47:32 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Lupita Araz And Suleyman Araz and in the Interest of: Harun Araz,Helin Araz

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Lupita Araz And Suleyman Araz and in the Interest of Harun Araz,Helin Araz was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Araz, Lupita

Dallas, TX 75370

Respondent

Araz, Suleyman

The Colony, TX 75056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($20.00); Payor: Araz, Suleyman; Receipt: Receipt # DC-19770-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $10.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $10.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Name Change $10.00; Comments: Declaration of No Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Name Change $10.00; Comments: Divorce Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: Araz, Suleyman; Receipt: Receipt # DC-06239-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $4.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $4.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($2.00); Payor: Araz, Suleyman; Receipt: Receipt # DC-05930-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $2.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($2.00); Payor: Araz, Suleyman; Receipt: Receipt # DC-05148-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $2.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($309.00); Payor: Araz, Lupita; Receipt: Receipt # DC-35372-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $309.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketWaiver of Service; Comments: Waiver of Service - Divorce (With Children)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet; Comments: Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less