Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/19/2021 at 13:52:48 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Linda Wood and Charles Posey Jr. Wood

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 In the Matter of the Marriage of Linda Wood and Charles Posey Jr Wood was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wood, Linda

Frisco, TX 75033

Respondent

Wood, Charles Posey, Jr.

10606 Stone Falls Lane

Frisco, TX 75035

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Shelby Don Hart

Respondent Attorney

Allen R. Griffin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreement Reached; Comments: 2.5 hr/side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $324.00, Payments: $324.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($2.00); Payor: Wood, Linda; Receipt: Receipt # DC-17367-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $324.00, Payments: $324.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $2.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketAgreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement; Comments: Rule 11 Agreement on Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSupplemental; Comments: Respondent's First Supplemental Designation of Expert Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketTemporary Orders Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $324.00, Payments: $324.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($65.00); Payor: Wood, Charles Posey; Receipt: Receipt # DC-01298-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $324.00, Payments: $324.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $65.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCounter Petition $65.00; Comments: Original Counterpetition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $324.00, Payments: $324.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($322.00); Payor: Wood, Linda; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00183-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $324.00, Payments: $324.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $322.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelby Don Hart