Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/16/2021 at 02:43:59 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Leighton Cook and Channing Cook and in the Interest of Audrey Elise Cook, Oliver Aaron Cook, Amelia Claire Cook and Henry Blake Cook, Children

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Leighton Cook and Channing Cook and in the Interest of Audrey Elise Cook, Oliver Aaron Cook, Amelia Claire Cook and Henry Blake Cook, Children was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Cook, Leighton Wayde

Plano, TX 75024

Cook, Leighton

Plano, TX 75024

Respondents

Cook, Channing Allen

Mckinney, TX 75070

Cook, Channing

Mckinney, TX 75070

Not Classified By Court

Attorney General

Dallas, TX 75208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Shanin Turner

Respondent Attorney

Clay Wilkinson

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Mary B. Stanley Renouf

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Place of Payment; Comments: Notice of Attorney General as Necessary Party and Change of Payee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketFinal Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove Up of Agreed Divorce and Termination of the Parent-Child Relationship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Voluntary Relinquishment of Parental Rights; Comments: Father's Affidavit for Voluntary Relinquishment of Parental Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Voluntary Relinquishment of Parental Rights; Comments: Father's Affidavit for Voluntary Relinquishment of Parental Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $325.00, Payments: $325.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($16.00); Payor: Cook, Leighton Wayde; Receipt: Receipt # DC-34521-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $325.00, Payments: $325.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $16.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Notice $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $325.00, Payments: $325.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($309.00); Payor: Cook, Leighton Wayde; Receipt: Receipt # DC-34162-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $325.00, Payments: $325.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $309.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary B. Stanley Renouf