This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:40:33 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Kimberly Michele Akery and Andrew Ernest Akery and In the Interest of E.G.A.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Kimberly Michele Akery and Andrew Ernest Akery and In the Interest of E G A was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Miskel, Emily. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Miskel, Emily

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Akery, Kimberly Michele

Mckinney, TX 75071

Respondent

Akery, Andrew Ernest

Plano, TX 75024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brandon Epperson

Respondent Attorney

Kelly J Schuler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $334.00, Payments: $334.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($15.00); Payor: Akery, Kimberly Michele; Receipt: Receipt # DC-27593-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $334.00, Payments: $334.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $15.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketIssued Employer's Withholding Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Employer's Withholding $15.00; Comments: Request for Issuance of Income Withholding for Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $334.00, Payments: $334.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($5.00); Payor: Phoenix Walden; Receipt: Receipt # DC-27166-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $334.00, Payments: $334.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $1.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketDisposition Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Divorce Decree Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketMotion to Sign; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Divorce Decree Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $334.00, Payments: $334.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($15.00); Payor: Akery, Kimberly Michele; Receipt: Receipt # DC-17418-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $334.00, Payments: $334.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $15.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $334.00, Payments: $334.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $65.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement; Comments: Rule 11 Agreement for Interim Temporary Orders Until Mediation is Completed and Hearing can be Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCounter Petition $65.00; Comments: Original Counterpetition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing on Request for Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: First Amended Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $334.00, Payments: $334.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($304.00); Payor: Akery, Kimberly Michele; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03375-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $334.00, Payments: $334.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $304.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $314.00

    Read MoreRead Less