Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/15/2021 at 16:05:39 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Khaled Kholy and Rania S. Hammad and in the Interest of Mia Kholy and Ibrahim Kholy

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Khaled Kholy and Rania S Hammad and in the Interest of Mia Kholy and Ibrahim Kholy was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kholy, Khaled

Dallas, TX 75248

Respondent

Hammad, Rania

Plano, TX 75093

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Kari Bohach

George R Bienfang

Respondent Attorney

Chris J Harding

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $323.00, Payments: $323.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($6.00); Payor: Hammad, Rania; Receipt: Receipt # DC-23543-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $323.00, Payments: $323.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $6.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Filing of Austin Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAgreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove-Up of Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw; Comments: Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketDesignation of; Comments: Designation of Attorney-In-Charge

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $323.00, Payments: $323.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($65.00); Payor: Hammad, Rania; Receipt: Receipt # DC-01314-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $323.00, Payments: $323.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $65.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCounter Petition $65.00; Comments: Original Counter-Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return of Service - Rania Hammad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $323.00, Payments: $323.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($317.00); Payor: Kholy, Khaled; Receipt: Receipt # DC-35130-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $323.00, Payments: $323.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $317.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chris J Harding