Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 04/06/2021 at 16:40:41 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Justin Switzler and Samantha Marietta Switzler and in the Interest of Ryder Switzler, A Child

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 In the Matter of the Marriage of Justin Switzler and Samantha Marietta Switzler and in the Interest of Ryder Switzler, A Child was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wheless, Cynthia M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wheless, Cynthia M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Switzler, Justin

Mckinney, TX 75070

Respondent

Switzler, Samantha Marietta

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Holly Joy Draper

Samantha Mori

Respondent Attorney

Dana C. Palmer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAgreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit For Prove-up of Agreed Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement; Comments: Rule 11- Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement; Comments: Rule 11 - Housing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Administrative Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketAdministrative Order; Comments: Order signed 1/3/2021 to transfer to the 417th Court.Order scanned into minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($314.00); Payor: Switzler, Justin; Receipt: Receipt # DC-28077-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $314.00, Payments: $314.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $314.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Service; Comments: Waiver of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dana C. Palmer