This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 01/15/2021 at 13:17:44 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Julie Gallini Lewis and Daniel Bryan Lewis and in the Interest of Elliana Renee Lewis, Eviana Danielle Lewis, and Chandler Joseph Lewis, Children

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Julie Gallini Lewis and Daniel Bryan Lewis and in the Interest of Elliana Renee Lewis, Eviana Danielle Lewis, and Chandler Joseph Lewis, Children was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgeworth, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Edgeworth, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lewis, Julie Gallini

Allen, TX 75013

Respondent

Lewis, Daniel Bryan

Dallas, TX 75231

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mary Ellen Neal

Respondent Attorney

Skylar Moore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $345.00, Payments: $345.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($10.00); Payor: Lewis, Julie Gallini; Receipt: Receipt # DC-15558-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $345.00, Payments: $345.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $10.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketConference with Judge; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Divorce Decree Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketIssued Employer's Withholding Order; Comments: Payroll Dallas Fire Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $345.00, Payments: $345.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($15.00); Payor: Lewis, Julie Gallini; Receipt: Receipt # DC-06163-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $345.00, Payments: $345.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $15.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Employer's Withholding $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $345.00, Payments: $345.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: Lewis, Julie Gallini; Receipt: Receipt # DC-04961-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $345.00, Payments: $345.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Notice $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $345.00, Payments: $345.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($312.00); Payor: Lewis, Julie Gallini; Receipt: Receipt # DC-04594-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $345.00, Payments: $345.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $312.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less