This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/14/2021 at 06:59:20 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Jude Duane Fleet vs. Regina Roytberg and in the Interest of C.A.F., Child

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Jude Duane Fleet filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Regina Roytberg and in the Interest of C A F , Child. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Miskel, Emily. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Miskel, Emily

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fleet, Jude Duane

Dallas, TX 75214

Respondent

Roytberg, Regina

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Terry Jarvis

Respondent Attorneys

Bradford Nace

Pamela Isaacson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketFinal Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketMotion to Enter; Time: 9:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Order to be Forthcoming

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMotion to Enter; Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Comments: Regina Roytberg's Motion to Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketAppearance of Counsel; Comments: Entry of Appearance and Designation of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Remote Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketMemorandum; Comments: Memorandum - Final Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $312.00, Payments: $312.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $65.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCounter Petition $65.00; Comments: Counter-Petition for Divorce and Request for Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Regina Roytberg's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Affidavit of Service - Citation - Regina Roytberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $312.00, Payments: $312.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($312.00); Payor: Fleet, Jude D; Receipt: Receipt # DC-06916-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $312.00, Payments: $312.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $312.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less