Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/17/2021 at 17:49:28 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Ichun Che and Bijan Houshmand and in the Interest of Cyrus Hanuman Houshmand-Che and Eleanor Lakshmi Houshmand-Che

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Ichun Che and Bijan Houshmand and in the Interest of Cyrus Hanuman Houshmand-Che and Eleanor Lakshmi Houshmand-Che was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Che, Ichun

Mckinney, TX 75070

Respondent

Houshmand, Bijan

Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gwen Rawls Williams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketIssued Employer's Withholding Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $348.00, Payments: $348.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($15.00); Payor: Che, Ichun; Receipt: Receipt # DC-10400-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $348.00, Payments: $348.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $15.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Employer's Withholding $15.00; Comments: Request for Issuance of Income Withholding for Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketAustin Form; Comments: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketFinal Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder - Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support; Comments: Income Withholding Order/Notice for Support (IWO)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Notice $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: First Amended Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $348.00, Payments: $348.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($317.00); Payor: Che, Ichun; Receipt: Receipt # DC-34903-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $348.00, Payments: $348.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $317.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gwen Rawls Williams