Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/28/2021 at 16:45:31 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Frank Antwi Mensah and Laquetta Antwi Mensah and in the Interest of J.A.M. and C.A.M., minor children

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 In the Matter of the Marriage of Frank Antwi Mensah and Laquetta Antwi Mensah and in the Interest of J A M and C A M , minor children was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mensah, Frank Antwi

Mckinney, TX 75069

Respondent

Mensah, Laquetta Antwi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dana C. Palmer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketTemporary Orders Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Order of Nonsuit to attorney; no address for respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOrder on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Notice of Nonsuit to attorney; no address for respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $327.00, Payments: $327.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: Mensah, Frank Antwi; Receipt: Receipt # DC-01589-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $327.00, Payments: $327.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $327.00, Payments: $327.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($319.00); Payor: Mensah, Frank Antwi; Receipt: Receipt # DC-01583-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $327.00, Payments: $327.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $319.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Citation Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Frank Antwi Mensah's Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dana C. Palmer