Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/18/2021 at 04:10:21 (UTC).

In The Matter Of The Marriage Of Erin Lynn Bradley And Willie Earl Bradley II And In The Interest Of Brandon Dean Bradley, A Child

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 In The Matter Of The Marriage Of Erin Lynn Bradley And Willie Earl Bradley II And In The Interest Of Brandon Dean Bradley, A Child was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Wynne, Lindsey and Tucker, Angela. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Wynne, Lindsey

Tucker, Angela

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bradley, Erin Lynn

Plano, TX 75074

Respondent

Bradley, Willie Earl, II

1305 Gristmill Lane

Celina, TX 75009

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Howard Shapiro

Respondent Attorney

Michael R Puhl

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMailed; Comments: DWOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Intervenor, Charges: $65.00, Payments: $65.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($2.00); Payor: Wentz & Zavarelli, LLP; Receipt: Receipt # DC-07846-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Intervenor, Charges: $65.00, Payments: $65.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $2.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Intervenor, Charges: $65.00, Payments: $65.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($65.00); Payor: The Shapiro Law Firm; Receipt: Receipt # DC-07661-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Intervenor, Charges: $65.00, Payments: $65.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $65.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketIntervention - Family $65.00; Comments: Petition in Intervention for Attorney's Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketTemporary Orders Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Notice $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Request for Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: Amended Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketAdministrative Order; Comments: Administrative Order of Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Intervenor, Charges: $65.00, Payments: $65.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($309.00); Payor: Bradley, Erin Lynn; Receipt: Receipt # DC-35219-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Intervenor, Charges: $65.00, Payments: $65.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $309.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard Shapiro