This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 08/11/2020 at 00:47:35 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Deborah Lynn Licare and Richard Charles Licare

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Deborah Lynn Licare and Richard Charles Licare was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McCraw, Piper. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McCraw, Piper

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Licare, Deborah Lynn

Frisco, TX 75035

Respondent

Licare, Richard Charles

Dallas, TX 75254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Deborah Mackoy

Respondent Attorney

Michael B Halla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Divorce Decree Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $308.00, Payments: $308.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($4.00); Payor: Taryn Rath; Receipt: Receipt # DC-21681-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $308.00, Payments: $308.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $4.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketAustin Form; Comments: Not Provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketAgreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $308.00, Payments: $308.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($304.00); Payor: Licare, Deborah Lynn; Receipt: Receipt # DC-04539-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $308.00, Payments: $308.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $304.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $314.00

    Read MoreRead Less