Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/19/2021 at 11:39:55 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Chauncey Ann Nixon andMichael Sean Cummins

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Chauncey Ann Nixon andMichael Sean Cummins was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nixon, Chauncey Ann

Wylie, TX 75098

Respondent

Cummins, Michael Sean

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

H Jay Boyer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAustin Form; Comments: Not Provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAgreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove- Up of Agreed Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove- Up of Agreed Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order; Comments: Qualified Domestic Relations Order for 401K Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent Michael Sean Cummins' Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $309.00, Payments: $309.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($2.00); Payor: Cummins, Michael Sean; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03070-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $309.00, Payments: $309.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $2.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order; Comments: Qualified Domestic Relations Order for 401k Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: entered quadro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $309.00, Payments: $309.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($309.00); Payor: Nixon, Chauncey Ann; Receipt: Receipt # DC-35281-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $309.00, Payments: $309.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $309.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less