Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/18/2021 at 04:55:44 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Marriage of Charise Thomason and Jason Thomason and in the Interest of LT., J.T. and F.T.

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 In the Matter of The Marriage of Charise Thomason and Jason Thomason and in the Interest of LT , J T and F T was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Thomason, Charise

Dallas, TX 75240

Respondent

Thomason, Jason

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michael D Rubin

Respondent Attorney

Avery Blake Rudd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Judgment Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order for Clarification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketOrder for Clarification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Attorney, Charges: $11.00, Payments: $11.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($60.00); Payor: Thomason, Jason; Receipt: Receipt # DC-11031-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Attorney, Charges: $11.00, Payments: $11.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $60.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMotion -Modify - Other REOPEN - OCA $60.00; Comments: Agreed Motion for Clarification of Prior Order for Refinancing Marital Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketOrder - Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support; Comments: Income Withholding Order/Notice for Support (IWO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Attorney, Charges: $11.00, Payments: $11.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($11.00); Payor: Rudd, Avery Blake; Receipt: Receipt # DC-05338-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAustin Form; Comments: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAgreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDivorce - Child - Docket Entry; Comments: Decree of Divorce granted.C/P settlement agreement approved and partitioned accordingly, personal property awarded to party in possession or ______________________________________________________________________________________________________.____________________ appointed JMCor MC with exclusive right to establish primary residence within ______________________ OR without geographic restriction._____________________appointed JMC or PC and ordered to pay $_________________ per ___________________, first payment due __________________________, reducing per 154.001 TXFC.Expanded OR non-expanded SPO Or _______________________________________________________________________ Wage withholding Ordered through SDU. Final Judgment forthcoming. Or Final Judgment rendered and entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketOrder of Withdrawal of Counsel; Comments: Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw; Comments: Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketAppearance of Counsel; Comments: Entry of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Attorney, Charges: $11.00, Payments: $11.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($309.00); Payor: Thomas, Charise; Receipt: Receipt # DC-35015-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Attorney, Charges: $11.00, Payments: $11.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $309.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D Rubin