Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/20/2021 at 00:16:57 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Bridget Stoecker and John Stoecker and in the Interest of J.O.S and J.R.S

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 In the Matter of the Marriage of Bridget Stoecker and John Stoecker and in the Interest of J O S and J R S was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McCraw, Piper. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McCraw, Piper

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Stoecker, Bridget

Mckinney, TX 75070

Respondent

Stoecker, John

Mckinney, TX 75070

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

J. Ryan Nordhaus

Respondent Attorney

Holly Joy Draper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Order Granting Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOrder on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Notice of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($322.00); Payor: Stoecker, Bridget; Receipt: Receipt # DC-19340-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $322.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Ryan Nordhaus