Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 09:08:43 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Bernadette W Kiboi vs. Nicholas Mbugua Ranji and in the Interest of C.K.R., a Child

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Bernadette W Kiboi filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Nicholas Mbugua Ranji and in the Interest of C K R , a Child. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kiboi, Bernadette W

Dallas, TX 75207

Respondent

Ranji, Nicholas Mbugua

Fairview, TX 75069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Irene Mugambi

Respondent Attorney

Zino Magbegor

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: 1.5 hr/side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset; Comments: 1.5 hr/side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAmended; Comments: Amended Respondent's Exhibit List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketExhibit List; Comments: Petitioner's List of Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketWitness List; Comments: Petitioner's Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketExhibit List; Comments: Respondent's Exhibit List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketWitness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Answer to Petitioner's Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMediation Action; Comments: Mediation Status Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Nicholas Mbugua Ranji - Divorce Citation - Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: Kiboi, Bernadette W; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00737-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($309.00); Payor: Kiboi, Bernadette W; Receipt: Receipt # DC-34651-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $309.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less