Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 06:48:40 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Anthony Colton Zampino and Mariya D. Zampino and in the Interest of Anthony Dean Zampino

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Anthony Colton Zampino and Mariya D Zampino and in the Interest of Anthony Dean Zampino was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Zampino, Anthony Colton

Mckinney, TX 75069

Respondent

Zampino, Mariya D.

Fairview, TX 75069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Abby M Foster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: 1 hr/side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCD submitted; Comments: CD and Thumbdrive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPetitioner's; Comments: Petitioner's Request for Production and Inspection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPetitioner's; Comments: Petitoner's Request for 194 Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: Email Correspondence Regarding Scheduling Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketMediation Action; Comments: Partial Mediated Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketTemporary Order; Comments: Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Filing of Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: First Amended Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $333.00, Payments: $333.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($317.00); Payor: Zampino, Anthony Colton; Receipt: Receipt # DC-34552-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $333.00, Payments: $333.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $317.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abby M Foster