Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 18:17:11 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Amanda May Sturgeon and Chad Steven Sturgeon and in the Interest of TSS ADS DJS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Amanda May Sturgeon and Chad Steven Sturgeon and in the Interest of TSS ADS DJS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sturgeon, Amanda May

Mckinney, TX 75070

Respondent

Sturgeon, Chad Steven

Dallas, TX 75238

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Christopher B. Norris

Respondent Attorney

Brad Nance

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketStatus; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Other; Comments: if needed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFinal Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: Case called. Petitioner's attorney appeared. Respondent appeared with attorney. Objections to the Petitioner's proposed order argued and ruled on. OTBF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMotion to Enter; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: Case called. Parties appeared with counsel. W/S, E/P. Divorce granted. Confirm agreements made in partial MSA and made an order of the Court. Mom is conservator, exclusive right to determine residence in Collin and contiguous, Mom will receive CS, Dad given expanded standard, 401k to be split equally, prior to the marriage Dad's separate property, CS to start March 1st, Mom to receive marital residence once appraisal is to be scheduled within next 30 days, and is to buy out 50% equity in home and is to refinance by May 1st and she is responsible for all cost related to finance, if not completed then home is to be sold; Vehicles in possession awarded to each party along with the debt, attorney fees previously ordered to be paid by March 1st by noon. All other debts to be split 50/50. If there are any issues, there will be a status hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: 1 hr/side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset; Comments: 2 hr/side Petitioner is ready

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: First Amended Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDesignation of; Comments: Designation of Attorney in Charge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $374.00, Payments: $374.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($65.00); Payor: Sturgeon, Amanda May; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00657-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $374.00, Payments: $374.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $65.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCounter Petition $65.00; Comments: Counter-Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $374.00, Payments: $374.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($309.00); Payor: Sturgeon, Amanda May; Receipt: Receipt # DC-34276-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $374.00, Payments: $374.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $309.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Original Petition For Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher B. Norris