Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 21:50:20 (UTC).

In the Estate Of Melvin Dwayne Russell

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 In the Estate Of Melvin Dwayne Russell was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Copeland, Weldon S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2020

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Copeland, Weldon S

 

Party Details

Decedent

Russell, Melvin Dwayne

Lucas, TX 75002

Not Classified By Court

All Interested Parties

Applicant

Strickland, Kathy Sue

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Reid Rector

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProbate Hearing; Time: 2:00 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Rescheduled; Comments: Set by Judge Copeland on 2/8/2021 to allow personal service on intestate heir.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProve Up; Time: 10:40 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Document Filed; Comments: Continued from 02/08/21 due to additional Waiver being filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $304.00, Payments: $304.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($22.00); Payor: Strickland, Kathy Sue; Receipt: Receipt # CC-PB-01202-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $304.00, Payments: $304.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $22.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $304.00, Payments: $304.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($3.00); Payor: Strickland, Kathy Sue; Receipt: Receipt # CC-PB-01198-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $304.00, Payments: $304.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $3.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Signed Order ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE.Judge Weldon Copeland

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketLast Will & Testament; Comments: Original Copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney Correspondence Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCitation Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $304.00, Payments: $304.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($279.00); Payor: Strickland, Kathy Sue; Receipt: Receipt # CC-PB-08238-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $304.00, Payments: $304.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $279.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCitation By Posting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAbstract for Application Voters Registration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCitation; Comments: 12.21.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketLast Will & Testament; Comments: (Copy) - 6 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketApplication for Letters Testamentary (OCA); Comments: (Copy of Will)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where All Interested Parties is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reid Rector