Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/04/2021 at 12:56:54 (UTC).

In the Estate Of John Douglas Norsworthy

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 In the Estate Of John Douglas Norsworthy was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Copeland, Weldon S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Copeland, Weldon S

 

Party Details

Decedent

Norsworthy, John Douglas

Sherman, TX 75090

Not Classified By Court

All Interested Parties

Applicant

Price, Tammy Michelle

Mckinney, TX 75070

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

Jacob Pelley

Applicant Attorney

David B. McCall, III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketInventory or Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAppointment of Resident Agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $358.00, Payments: $358.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($22.00); Payor: McCall, David B., III; Receipt: Receipt # CC-PB-00654-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $358.00, Payments: $358.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $22.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Signed Order(s) DETERMINING / DECLARING HEIRSHIP and Authorizing INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION.Judge Weldon Copeland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Facts Concerning the Identity of Heirs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketOath

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketJudgment Declare Heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $358.00, Payments: $358.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $358.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketOrder Appoint Atty Ad Litem (OCA); Comments: Pelley, Jacob

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCitation By Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCitation By Posting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAbstract for Application Voters Registration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCitation by Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCitation; Comments: 01.20.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Heirship (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketConstable PCT #1 - Publication Notice - $79.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketApplication for Independent Administration (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where All Interested Parties is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David B. McCall, III