Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 12/03/2020 at 12:55:11 (UTC).

In the Estate Of Jarvis W. Ford

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 In the Estate Of Jarvis W Ford was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Copeland, Weldon S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Copeland, Weldon S

 

Party Details

Decedent

Ford, Jarvis W.

Applicant

Starnes, Margaret A.

Dallas, TX 75219

Not Classified By Court

All Interested Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Angelica Farinacci

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketOrder Approve Inventory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $281.00, Payments: $281.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($2.00); Payor: Starnes, Margaret A.; Receipt: Receipt # CC-PB-02090-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $281.00, Payments: $281.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $2.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAffidavit/Certificate of Notice to Beneficiaries

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketInventory or Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory (OCA); Comments: Inventory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOath

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOrder Admit Letters Testamentary & Issue Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Death; Comments: Angelica L Farinacci

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Signed Order ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE.Judge Weldon Copeland

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketRenunciation of Right to Letters; Comments: Waiver of Notice and Consent - Frances J. Jackson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCitation Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketLast Will & Testament; Comments: Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $281.00, Payments: $281.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($279.00); Payor: Starnes, Margaret A.; Receipt: Receipt # CC-PB-00096-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $281.00, Payments: $281.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $279.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCitation By Posting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAbstract for Application Voters Registration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCitation; Comments: 01.20.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketLast Will & Testament; Comments: 12 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketApplication for Letters Testamentary (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where All Interested Parties is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angelica Farinacci