Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/17/2021 at 20:28:28 (UTC).

In Re: Order of Foreclosure Concerning 6406 Capulet Place Dallas, Texas 75252 Under Tex. R. Civ. P. 736 The Entrust Group, Inc. FBO Latha Maram Ira #7230012565

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 In Re Order of Foreclosure Concerning 6406 Capulet Place Dallas, Texas 75252 Under Tex R Civ P 736 The Entrust Group, Inc FBO Latha Maram Ira 7230012565 was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Nowak, Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Nowak, Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Davenport Meadows Homeowners Association, Inc.

The Pellar Law Firm, Pllc, 2591 Dallas Parkway, Suite 300

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendants

Any and All Occupants

Dallas, TX 75252

The Entrust Group Inc fbo Latha Maram IRA #7230012565

6406 Capulet Pl

Dallas, TX 75252-6048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel E Pellar

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $490.00, Payments: $490.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($490.00); Payor: Davenport Meadows Homeowners Association, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-24153-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $490.00, Payments: $490.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $490.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Mail Service - Citation Expedite Foreclosure $91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Application for Expedited Foreclosure Proceeding Pursuant to Rule 736 of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION FBO JAMES MARTIN CLARK ACCOUNT NUMBER 7230011412 is a litigant