This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 10/02/2020 at 00:21:34 (UTC).

In Re: Order for Foreclosure Concerning 4525 Turnberry Ct Plano, TX 75024-2156 Under Tex. R. Civ. Proc. 736 Petitioner: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association Respondent(s): Steve Chung and Mee A Chung

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 In Re Order for Foreclosure Concerning 4525 Turnberry Ct Plano, TX 75024-2156 Under Tex R Civ Proc 736 Petitioner JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association Respondent s Steve Chung and Mee A Chung was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Thompson, Andrea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Thompson, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

Mccarthy & Holthus, Llp, 1255 West 15Th Street, Suite 1060

Plano, TX 75075

Defendants

Any and All Occupants

Plano, TX 75024-2156

Chung, Steve

Plano, TX 75024-2156

Chung, Mee A

Plano, TX 75024-2156

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thuy Frazier

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $573.00, Payments: $573.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($1.00); Payor: Rosa Cazares; Receipt: Receipt # DC-12050-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $573.00, Payments: $573.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $1.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Judgment Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketOrder of Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketService Member & Sailor's Affidavit; Comments: Non-Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMotion; Comments: Petitioner's Motion for Entry of Order in Accordance with Tex R. Civ. P. 736.7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $573.00, Payments: $573.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($1.00); Payor: McCarthy - Holthus; Receipt: Receipt # DC-07888-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $573.00, Payments: $573.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $1.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $573.00, Payments: $573.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($571.00); Payor: JPMorgan Chase BankNA; Receipt: Receipt # DC-05220-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $573.00, Payments: $573.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $571.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Mail Service - Citation Expedite Foreclosure $91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Service Request Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Application for an Expedited Order Under Rule 736 on a Home Equity, Reverse Mortgage, or Home Equity Line of Credit Loan

    Read MoreRead Less