This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 04/11/2019 at 16:42:50 (UTC).

In Re: Order for Foreclosure Concerning 4200 Tidworth Dr, Plano, TX 75093 Under Tex. R. Civ. Proc. 736 Petitioner: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC as Servicing Agent for the Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA the Bank of New Yo

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 In Re Order for Foreclosure Concerning 4200 Tidworth Dr, Plano, TX 75093 Under Tex R Civ Proc 736 Petitioner Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC as Servicing Agent for the Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association FKA the Bank of New Yo was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Roach, John R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Roach, John R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Defendants

Shambayati, Majid

Current Occupant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley Conway

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Mailed; Comments: Judgment letter to Plaintiff's attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Default Judgment Letter Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Order of Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Service Member & Sailor's Affidavit; Comments: Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Certificate of Last Known Address; Comments: Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment; Comments: Petitioner's Motion for Default Order Allowing Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Request for Mail Service - Citation Expedite Foreclosure $91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $298.00; Comments: Application for an Expedited Order Under Rule 736 on a Home Equity, Reverse Mortgage, or Home Equity Line of Credit Loan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $480.00, Payments: $480.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($480.00); Payor: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03982-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $480.00, Payments: $480.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $480.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Order of Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less