This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 08/28/2020 at 17:40:36 (UTC).

ICON Roofing & Construction, LLC,Dana Gregory vs. Rowley Roofing and Construction, Inc.,Colson Rowley,Mandi Rowley

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 ICON Roofing Construction, LLC,Dana Gregory filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rowley Roofing and Construction, Inc ,Colson Rowley,Mandi Rowley. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Tucker, Angela. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Tucker, Angela

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gregory, Dana

Frisco, TX 75034

ICON Roofing & Construction, LLC

Scheef & Stone, L.L.P., 2600 Network Boulevard, Suite 400

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendants

Rowley Roofing and Construction, Inc.

1027 East 15Th Street

Plano, TX 75074

Rowley, Colson

Plano, TX 75074

Rowley, Mandi

Frisco, TX 75034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark L Hill

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan M Allen

Luke Laman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketAgreed Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Certifed Copies of Notice of Non-suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Per Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: COVID19 - SCT EMERGENCY DISASTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Evidence In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizen Participation Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participant Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $168.00, Payments: $168.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($80.00); Payor: Rowley Roofing and Construction, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-09349-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $168.00, Payments: $168.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $80.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketCounter Claim $80.00; Comments: Defendant's Verified Original Answer, Special Denial, Affirmative Defenses, Original Counterclaim and Application for Temporary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $168.00, Payments: $168.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($298.00); Payor: ICON Roofing and Construction, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-08353-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $168.00, Payments: $168.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $298.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Plaintiffs' Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less