This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 01/16/2021 at 12:35:29 (UTC).

Hunters Glen Apts vs. Regina Bonaventure

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Hunters Glen Apts filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Regina Bonaventure. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0280

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hunters Glen Apts

6400 Independence Pkwy

Plano, TX 75023

Defendant

Bonaventure, Regina

Plano, TX 75023

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketMail Returned to Court - Moved or Bad Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Eviction Default - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMailed Signed Judgment to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketEviction Default - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketFailed to Appear Certificate Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Hunters Glen Apts; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001406-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less