Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/29/2020 at 02:21:54 (UTC).

Homes of Prairie Springs,Lincoln Property Company vs. Adrien Birdlong

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 Homes of Prairie Springs,Lincoln Property Company filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Adrien Birdlong. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0341

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lincoln Property Company

Homes of Prairie Springs

280 W Renner Rd

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Birdlong, Adrien

Richardson, TX 75080

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketMail Returned to Court - Moved or Bad Address; Comments: Adrien Birdlong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketFailed to Appear Certificate Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMailed Signed Judgment to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketFailed to Appear Certificate Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Hearing; Comments: to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Homes of Prairie Springs; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001708-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Homes of Prairie Springs is a litigant

Latest cases where LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY DBA TEXAS LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY is a litigant