This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/20/2020 at 10:21:54 (UTC).

Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc vs. Latosha Martin

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Latosha Martin. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0082

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc

Po Box 535

Royse City, TX 75189

Defendant

Martin, Latosha Retha

Royse City, TX 75189

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for hearing on 09/23/19changed hearing type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: For hearing on 092319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02462-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less