This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 09/25/2019 at 16:30:03 (UTC).

Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc vs. Kaly Oliver,Curtis Oliver

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kaly Oliver,Curtis Oliver. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0084

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc

Po Box 535

Royse City, TX 75189

Defendants

Oliver, Curtis

Royse City, TX 75189

Oliver, Kaly M

Royse City, TX 75189

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • Small Claims Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Mail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for hearing on 10/07/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Citation Served; Comments: Kaly Oliver & Curtis Oliver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Civil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Receipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($201.00); Payor: Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02464-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $150.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $201.00;

    Read MoreRead Less