This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 01/31/2020 at 00:45:27 (UTC).

Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc vs. Charles Lister,Randi Lister

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Charles Lister,Randi Lister. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0083

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc

Po Box 535

Royse City, TX 75189

Defendants

Lister, Randi Sue

Royse City, TX 75189

Lister, Charles Joseph

Royse City, TX 75189

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Time: 10:15 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for hearing set on 1/06/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for hearing on 11/05/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: Randi Lister

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: Charles Lister

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $201.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($201.00); Payor: Hidden Creek Estates HOA Inc; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02463-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $150.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less