This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/16/2021 at 19:26:16 (UTC).

HFH Capital, LLC vs. Supreme Sand Haulers, LLC and Joshua Morgan, Defendants and Midsouth Bank, Garnishee

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 HFH Capital, LLC filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Supreme Sand Haulers, LLC and Joshua Morgan, Defendants and Midsouth Bank, Garnishee. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Baxter, Lance. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Baxter, Lance

 

Party Details

Defendants

Supreme Sand Haulers, LLC

1640 Greenwood Court

Prosper, TX 75078

Morgan, Joshua

Longview, TX 75064

Garnishor

HFH Capital, LLC

Scheinthal & Kouts, L.L.P., 4635 Southwest Freeway, Suite 720

Houston, TX 77027

Garnishee

Midsouth Bank

P.O. Box 61260

New Orleans, LA 70161-1260

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Garnishor Attorney

Alan R Scheinthal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketOut of County Service Fee(Bill of Cost Form); Comments: 150.00 Jefferson Co Pct 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketE-Served through E-Filing Portal; Comments: 36884762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Garnishor, Charges: $277.00, Payments: $277.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($277.00); Payor: HFH Capital, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # CC-CV-03992-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Garnishor, Charges: $277.00, Payments: $277.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $277.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Writ Post Judgment - $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Garnishment Post Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Supreme Sand Haulers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HFH Capital, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MidSouth Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scheinthal, Alan R.