Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 14:18:06 (UTC).

Heart to Heart Hospice, LLC, Heart to Heart Hospice Holdings, LLC and Strong River, LLC vs. Falcon South Plains Hospice, LP d/b/a Interim Hospice of San Antonio, Interim Hospice of West Texas, and Interim Hospice of Grandbury; Interim Healthcare of W

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Heart to Heart Hospice, LLC, Heart to Heart Hospice Holdings, LLC and Strong River, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Falcon South Plains Hospice, LP d/b/a Interim Hospice of San Antonio, Interim Hospice of West Texas, and Interim Hospice of Grandbury Interim Healthcare of W. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Bouressa, Andrea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Bouressa, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Heart to Heart Hospice Holdings, LLC

Hiersche, Hayward, Drakely & Urbach, P.C., 15303 Dallas Parkway, Suite 700

Addison, TX 75001

Heart to Heart Hospice, LLC

Hiersche, Hayward, Drakely & Urbach, P.C., 15303 Dallas Parkway, Suite 700

Addison, TX 75001

Strong River, LLC

Hiersche, Hayward, Drakely & Urbach, P.C., 15303 Dallas Parkway, Suite 700

Addison, TX 75001

Heart to Heart of Texas, Ltd.

Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C., 500 N. Akard St., Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendants

Bullard, James

Lubbock, TX 79423

Falcon South Plains Hospice, LP

Registered Agent, James Bullard

Lubbock, TX 79423

Falcon Healthcare, Inc.

Registered Agent, James Bullard

Lubbock, TX 79423

Durbin, John Brandon

Mckinney, TX 75070

Interim Healthcare of West Texas, LLC

Registered Agent, James Bullard

Lubbock, TX 79423

Schwarz, Brad

Burleson, TX 76028

Maberry, Donnie

Dallas, TX 75204

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A Harris

Defendant Attorneys

Ann Marie Painter

J Neal Prevost

Alan Dabdoub

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Ann/Appearance; Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Time: 10:30 AM; Comments: by video- No-evidence motion for summary judgment field by Defendants Brad Schwarz and Donnie Maberry filed 1/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Time: 10:00 AM; Comments: by video- No-evidence motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants Falcon South Plains Hospice, LP; Interim Healthcare of West Texas, LLC; Falcon Healthcare, Inc.; James Bullard; and John Brandon Durbin filed 1/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMotion To Compel; Time: 9:30 AM; Comments: by video- Motion to Compel related to Defendant Durbin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMotion To Compel; Time: 10:30 AM; Comments: by video- Motion to Compel related to Defendant Interim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing on Defendants' No-Evidence Motion for Summay Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAmended; Comments: First Amended Notice of Hearing on Defendants Donnie Maberry and Brad Schwarz's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Written Discovery Responses and Production of Documents from Defendant John Brandon Durbin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Written Discovery Responses and Production of Documents from Defendants Falcon South Plains Hospice, LP, Interim Healthcare of West Texas, LLC, Falcon Healthcare, Inc., and James Bullard

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return of Service - Durbin, John Brandon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Affidavit of Service - Falcon Healthcare, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Affidavit of Service - Falcon South Plains Hospice, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Affidavit of Service - Interim Health Care of West Texas, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Citation - James Bullard - Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $404.00, Payments: $404.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($364.00); Payor: Heart to Heart Hospice, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00425-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $404.00, Payments: $404.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $364.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Plaintiffs' Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less