This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 07/07/2020 at 01:18:49 (UTC).

Grove Park Apartments vs. Lawrence Clark

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Grove Park Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Lawrence Clark. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0268

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grove Park Apartments

1705 Jupiter Road

Plano, TX 75074

Defendant

Clark, Lawrence Gene

Plano, TX 75074

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketAppeal Received Document(s) from CCL Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketRefund Due; Comments: Writ cannot be issued by JP court- appeal was filed & perfected by defendant.KC took writ request in error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCertification of Transcript; Judge: Missildine, Mike; Comments: THE STATE OF TEXAS COUNTY OF COLLIN Missildine, Mike JUSTICE COURT 3-2I hereby certify that the attached 23 pages are true and exact copies of the official court records for case number 32-EV-19-00268Witnessed my hand and official seal at the Court in Plano, Collin County Texas05/08/2019By Haley Nichols Justice Court Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketAppealed to CCL (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketBill of Cost

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketStatement of Inability to Pay Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: Grove Park Apartments; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001768-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comments: with certificate of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Grove Park Apartments; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001389-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less