This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 16:11:40 (UTC).

Glen Knoll, LLC vs. Bonifacio Vanegas Paz and All Occupants

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Glen Knoll, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Bonifacio Vanegas Paz and All Occupants. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0361

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glen Knoll, LLC

Brady Law Firm, Pllc, 6351 Preston Road, Suite 160

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendant

Bonifacio Vanegas Paz and All Occupants

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn K Brady

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • Eviction Hearing; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Withdrawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Letter from Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Eviction Citation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Letter From:; Comments: cover letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Notice of Hearing; Comments: mailed to filer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Receipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Eviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Brady, Shawn K; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03462-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Civil Papers-: Person to Serve: Vanegas Paz, Bonifacio Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 2; Paper No: C2-19-002306; Location: PCT 2 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn K Brady