This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 11/12/2020 at 14:09:59 (UTC).

FRISCO ISD Vs. ROBERT S. LUPER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/03/2006 FRISCO ISD filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ROBERT S LUPER. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Oldner, Chris. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6406

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Oldner, Chris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frisco Isd

Abernathy Roeder Boyd Hullett, 1700 N.Redbud Blvd.. #300

Mckinney, TX 75070

Defendants

Luper, Anne M

Frisco, TX 75034

Meadow Hill Estate

Agent: Fred Shapiro, 5728 Lbj Frwy, #300

Dallas, TX 75240

Luper, Robert S

Frisco, TX 75034

Mortgage, Electronic

Prentice Hall Corp System, 2711 Centerville Road

Wilmington, DE 198081645

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David B. McCall, III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2007
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID FOR TAX CITS/ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID FOR TAX CITS/ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID FOR TAX INTERVENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PD FOR TAX CIT W SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PD FOR TAX CIT W SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID FOR TAX CIT CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID FOR TAX CIT CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • DocketConversion; Comments: MONEY PAID FOR TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: NOTICE OF NOSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: DISCLAIMER OF CITY OF FRISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $393.00, Payments: $393.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $10.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $393.00, Payments: $393.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($110.00); Payor: Auto Generated Conversion Entr; Receipt: Receipt # DCVNEG44916; Description: Escrow from Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $393.00, Payments: $393.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $110.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $393.00, Payments: $393.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($223.00); Payor: Auto Generated Conversion Entr; Receipt: Receipt # DCVNEG44915; Description: Escrow from Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $393.00, Payments: $393.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $223.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: TAX INTERVENTIONS/NO MONEY RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: REQ FOR 2 TAX CITS BY MAIL/NO MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: 2 TAX CITS/SERVICE ONLY/NO MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: REQ FOR 2 TAX CITS/NO MONEY REC'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • DocketConversion; Comments: TAX SUITS/NO MONEY RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David B. McCall, III