This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 02/25/2022 at 14:29:50 (UTC).

Francisco Javier Perez a/k/a Javier Perez vs. Trammell King

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 Francisco Javier Perez a/k/a Javier Perez filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Trammell King. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0462

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Javier Perez a/k/a Javier Perez

Plano, TX 75093-4461

Defendant

King, Trammell D.

Dallas, TX 75252

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Israel L. Suster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Emailed /mailed to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: King, Trammell Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 3; Paper No: C3-22-001223; Location: PCT 3 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $129.00, Payments: $129.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($21.00); Description: State Credit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $129.00, Payments: $129.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($108.00); Payor: FranciscoJavier Perez a/k/a Javier Perez; Receipt: Receipt # 2022-0001551-JP3; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $129.00, Payments: $129.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $129.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $129.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition for Forcible Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Israel L. Suster