Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 10/10/2019 at 16:42:35 (UTC).

Fox Trails vs. Denisha Williams

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 Fox Trails filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Denisha Williams. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0344

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fox Trails

Plano, TX 75023

Defendant

Williams, Denisha

Plano, TX 75023

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Mailed Signed Judgment to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Failed to Appear Certificate Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Eviction Default - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Eviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Citation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • No Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Eviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Eviction Suit; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Fox Trails; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001767-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Eviction Default - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $1,040.00;

    Read MoreRead Less