Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/15/2021 at 03:50:10 (UTC).

First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation vs. Bernice T. Whitesell

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Bernice T Whitesell. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Benjamin N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Benjamin N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation

Bonial And Associates, P.C., 14841 Dallas Parkway Suite 425

Dallas, TX 75254

Defendant

Whitesell, Bernice T.

Royse City, TX 75189

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Burns

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return of Service - Citation - Bernice T. Whitesell - Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation; Receipt: Receipt # DC-21288-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Administrative Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketAdministrative Order; Comments: Admin Order of Assignment scanned into the Minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($308.00); Payor: First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation; Receipt: Receipt # DC-13862-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $316.00, Payments: $316.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $308.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Burns