This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 08/17/2020 at 00:43:14 (UTC).

Ex Parte Ty William Thomas

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Ex Parte Ty William Thomas was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Roach, John R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Roach, John R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

State of Texas

Applicant

Thomas, Ty William

Plano, TX 75023

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Maria T Tu

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketStatus; Time: 1:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketStatus; Time: 1:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order for Habeas Corpus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Certified Order to bookinSGT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketOrder for Habeas Corpus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Personal bond is granted in the amount of $25,000 pursuant to 17.032 with conditions listed on the bond.The transcript of the hearing is order to be sealed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docket17.032 Hearing; Time: 1:00 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Docket17.032 Hearing; Time: 1:00 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Docket17.032 Hearing; Time: 1:00 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $0.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $110.00; Description: Bond Reduction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $0.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $110.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Setting on Writ of Habeas Corpus Under C.C.P. 17.032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Setting on Writ of Habeas Corpus Under C.C.P. 17.032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketWrit Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketWrit of Habeas Corpus - Bond Reduction (OCA) $120.00; Comments: Writ of Habeas Corpus Under C.C.P. 17.032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less