This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 08/16/2019 at 15:00:27 (UTC).

Ex Parte Johnathan Michael Allen

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 Ex Parte Johnathan Michael Allen was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgeworth, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Edgeworth, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Applicant

Allen, Johnathan Michael

Plano, TX 75024

Not Classified By Court

State of Texas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Bill J Stovall

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: Docket Entry to Bookin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • General Docket Entry; Comments: Per Judge EdgeworthNo GPS or ELM is requried as condiiton of bond-JDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Passport Registry Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: to Bookin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Order to Reduce Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • General Docket Entry; Comments: Motion for bond Reduction is granted in TRN#9276515755 A001 and lowered to 125,000.00 with bond conditions imposing standard CAC bond Conditions and can have access to computer or internet and surrender passport and supervised vistation pursuant to CPS wife to give state teh Bedford Address today 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Bond Reduction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Notice of Hearing; Comments: Order Setting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Writ Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Writ of Habeas Corpus - Bond Reduction (OCA) $115.00; Comments: Writ of Habeas Corpus Motion to Reduce Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $0.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $110.00; Description: Bond Reduction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Applicant, Charges: $0.00, Payments: $0.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $110.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Order to Reduce Bond

    Read MoreRead Less