This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/08/2019 at 16:16:40 (UTC).

Estates of Richardson vs. Edgar Austin

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Estates of Richardson filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Edgar Austin. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0283

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Estates of Richardson

955 W. President George Bush

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Austin, Edgar

Richardson, TX 75080

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • Eviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Mailed Signed Judgment to Both Sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Eviction - Dismissed per Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Eviction Citation Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Eviction Plaintiff's Request to Dismiss by Fax

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Eviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Receipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Estates of Richardson; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001409-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Eviction - Dismissed per Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $1,365.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Civil Papers-: Person to Serve: Austin, Edgar Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Precinct 3-2; Paper No: C3-19-003451; Location: PCT 3 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less