This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 09/04/2020 at 00:39:13 (UTC).

Estates of Richardson vs. Baron Jacobs

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Estates of Richardson filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Baron Jacobs. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0282

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Estates of Richardson

955 W. President George Bush

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Jacobs, Baron

Richardson, TX 75080

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketEviction Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: Estates of Richardson; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001781-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Filed with The Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Eviction Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketEviction Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Estates of Richardson; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001409-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less