This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/20/2020 at 00:44:07 (UTC).

Equipmentshare.com, Inc. vs. Platform Manufacturing Group LLC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Equipmentshare com, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Platform Manufacturing Group LLC. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Benjamin N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Benjamin N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equipmentshare.com, Inc.

500 N. Akard, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant

Platform Manufacturing Group LLC

6301 Preston Rd., Suite 700

Plano, TX 75024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard J. Wallace, III

Defendant Attorney

J. Duncan Webb, IV

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Order of Nonsuit with Prejudice to both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketOrder on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketOrder; Comments: Order of Nonsuit without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Notice; Comments: notice of nonsuit to both attorneys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Platform Manufacturing Group LLC - Civil Citation - Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: Equipmentshare.com, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-01922-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less