This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 02/15/2020 at 00:09:25 (UTC).

EDWARDS PRINTING SERVICE, INC vs. BERLIN CAFE + BAR

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 EDWARDS PRINTING SERVICE, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BERLIN CAFE BAR. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0152

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARDS PRINTING SERVICE, INC

7651 Main St

Frisco, TX 75034

Defendant

BERLIN CAFE + BAR

Frisco, TX 75034

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Cause Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCause Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: NOVEMBER 15, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed; Comments: served 7.25.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: TO DENTON COUNTY PCT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCheck for Service Written; Comments: to Denton Cty // gave signed ck to MC to mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($75.00); Payor: EDWARDS PRINTING SERVICE, INC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05378-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCitation Returned Unserved; Comments: BY CON4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketService; Comments: FEE PD TO DENTON CTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: EDWARDS PRINTING SERVICE, INC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05197-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less