This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/08/2021 at 20:14:44 (UTC).

Dyan Dunn vs. Brian Fox,Xu Wang

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Dyan Dunn filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Brian Fox,Xu Wang. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Willis, Jill and Tucker, Angela. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Willis, Jill

Tucker, Angela

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dunn, Dyan

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendants

Wang, Xu

Frisco, TX 75035-2558

Fox, Brian

Frisco, TX 75035-2558

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad W Eaton

Defendant Attorney

Shasta P.C. Oribhabor

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($40.00); Payor: Fox, Brian; Receipt: Receipt # DC-19522-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $40.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketJury Fee Paid $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Administrative Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketAdministrative Order; Comments: Order signed 8/31/2020 to transfer to 199th.Order scanned into minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Affidavit of Service- Xu Wang

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Affidavit of Service- Brian Fox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($324.00); Payor: Dunn, Dyan; Receipt: Receipt # DC-17385-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $324.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad W Eaton