This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/22/2020 at 00:09:51 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. BROOKE DAVIS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BROOKE DAVIS. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0267

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

15660 Dallas, Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

DAVIS, BROOKE E

Frisco, TX 75035

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: To both parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 1:00 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Order to be Forthcoming

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketDWOP Hearing; Comments: JUNE 7, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketReturn of Service Filed; Comments: SERVED 2.15.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $46.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: EMAILED - RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: Discover Bank; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-00927-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less